Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR504 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/03/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 504
 In Memory
 of
 Tommy Williams
 WHEREAS, A life made rich though meaningful service drew to
 a close with the passing of former Atascosa County sheriff Tommy
 Williams on April 8, 2023, at the age of 86; and
 WHEREAS, Tommy Williams was born on February 25, 1937;
 answering his nation's call to duty, he joined the U.S. Army in
 1957, and he proudly served for six years; and
 WHEREAS, On January 1, 1973, Mr. Williams became sheriff
 of Atascosa County, and in the course of his tenure, he earned
 statewide recognition and the deep respect and admiration of his
 colleagues for his generosity, professionalism, and steadfast
 commitment to duty; he ultimately concluded his time in office on
 December 31, 2012, after four decades of dedicated service; a
 leader in his field, he was a Lifetime Member and past president
 of the Sheriffs' Association of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Blessed with a devoted family, Mr. Williams
 shared a rewarding marriage with his wife, Sandra, who preceded
 him in death; he took great pride in their daughter, Amber, and
 with the passing years, he had the pleasure of welcoming into his
 family a granddaughter, Paige, and a grandson, John; and
 WHEREAS, A man of honesty and integrity who made an
 indelible impact in his community, Tommy Williams leaves behind a
 legacy that will long be treasured by all those who held him dear;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Tommy Williams
 and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to
 his daughter, Amber Carter, and her wife, Calli; to his
 granddaughter, Paige Merryman; to his grandson, John Merryman;
 to his cousin, Darrell Hickey, and his wife, Sandy; to his bonus
 daughters, Dicki Lee Poppell-Sparks and Minda Hyde; and to his
 other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Tommy Williams.
 Flores
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 3, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate