Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR513 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/03/2023

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 513
 In Memory
 of
 Mary Yturria
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Mary Elizabeth Altman Yturria of Brownsville on
 December 27, 2022, at the age of 97; and
 WHEREAS, Born in York, Alabama, on May 9, 1925, to John and
 Dorothy Altman, the former Mary Altman grew up with the
 companionship of three younger siblings, Dorothy, Eleanor, and
 John; as a child, she moved with her family to New Orleans, where
 she graduated from the Sophie Wright School for Girls; she
 studied for a year at Louisiana State University, and worked as a
 flight attendant for Pan American Airways; she married Frank
 Yturria on May 9, 1947; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Yturria and her husband shared more than
 seven decades together and raised two daughters, Mary Eleanor and
 Dorothy; they lived for two years in the Philippines, where
 Mr. Yturria was deployed as an air force reservist, before the
 family settled in Brownsville; Mrs. Yturria was later blessed
 with three grandchildren, George, Leslie, and Alexandra, as well
 as five great-grandsons, Daniel, Isaac, Colin, Alexander, and
 Ben; and
 WHEREAS, A resident of Brownsville for 75 years,
 Mrs. Yturria sought opportunities to give back to the community;
 she held leadership positions in charitable organizations
 focused on historic preservation, the arts, literacy, health,
 safety, and education, and she and Mr. Yturria proudly served as
 cofounders of the Republican Party of Cameron County; through the
 years, Mrs. Yturria played a role in the creation of a number of
 civic organizations as well, and she and her husband were
 recognized for their efforts to promote education in the Rio
 Grande Valley with the dedication of the Mary & Frank Yturria
 Elementary School; in addition to various other accolades, she
 was honored by the City of Brownsville's proclamation of May 9,
 her birthday, as Mary Yturria Day; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of strong faith, Mrs. Yturria was a
 lifelong member of the Church of the Advent, Episcopal, in
 Brownsville; in her leisure time, she enjoyed gardening,
 traveling, cooking, and entertaining, and she instilled a
 passion for creative pursuits in her daughters and
 grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mary Yturria touched countless lives through her
 kind and generous service to others, and all those who were
 blessed to share in the warmth of her affection will forever hold
 her close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Mary Elizabeth
 Altman Yturria and extend sincere sympathy to her family and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Mary Yturria.
 LaMantia
 Alvarado Hancock Nichols Alvarado Hancock Nichols
Alvarado Hancock Nichols
 Bettencourt Hinojosa Parker Bettencourt Hinojosa Parker
Bettencourt Hinojosa Parker
 Birdwell Huffman Paxton Birdwell Huffman Paxton
Birdwell Huffman Paxton
 Blanco Hughes Perry Blanco Hughes Perry
Blanco Hughes Perry
 Campbell Johnson Schwertner Campbell Johnson Schwertner
Campbell Johnson Schwertner
 Creighton King Sparks Creighton King Sparks
Creighton King Sparks
 Eckhardt Kolkhorst Springer Eckhardt Kolkhorst Springer
Eckhardt Kolkhorst Springer
 Flores Menéndez West Flores Menéndez West
Flores Menéndez West
 Gutierrez Middleton Whitmire Gutierrez Middleton Whitmire
Gutierrez Middleton Whitmire
 Hall Miles Zaffirini Hall Miles Zaffirini
Hall Miles Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 3, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Alvarado Hancock Nichols

Bettencourt Hinojosa Parker

Birdwell Huffman Paxton

Blanco Hughes Perry

Campbell Johnson Schwertner

Creighton King Sparks

Eckhardt Kolkhorst Springer

Flores Menéndez West

Gutierrez Middleton Whitmire

Hall Miles Zaffirini