Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR576 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R28747 KSM-D
 By: Gutierrez S.R. No. 576


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Citizens of Uvalde lost two beloved residents with
 the tragic passing of Irma Linda Garcia on May 24, 2022, at the age
 of 48, and her husband, Jose Antonio Garcia, on May 26, 2022, at the
 age of 50; and
 WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia formed a strong and lasting bond
 of devotion during the 25 years they shared as husband and wife;
 they were high school sweethearts who went on to exchange wedding
 vows in Uvalde on June 28, 1997, and they took immense joy in
 raising their four children, Lyliana, Alysandra, Cristian, and
 Jose; and
 WHEREAS, Born in San Antonio on December 11, 1973, Irma
 Garcia was the daughter of Manuel Z. Lozano and Olga Salazar; she
 grew up with the companionship of two sisters, Velma and Marissa,
 and a brother, Marcus; after receiving her bachelor's degree in
 interdisciplinary studies from Sul Ross State University in 1997,
 she embarked on a 23-year career as an elementary teacher with the
 Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District; she found great
 fulfillment in engaging with her students and helping to set them on
 a path toward higher education; and
 WHEREAS, Joe Garcia was born in Uvalde on April 18, 1972, and
 was raised by his mother, Maria Garcia, along with his three
 siblings, Armando, Maria, and Antonio; for more than three decades,
 he was employed with H-E-B, where he rose from produce stocker to a
 position in management; throughout his career, he was admired by
 his colleagues for his work ethic and his drive to ensure that every
 task was done the right way; and
 WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia shared an unwavering commitment
 to their family, to their community, and to one another, and the
 couple will forever remain a source of inspiration to all who were
 fortunate enough to know them; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the 88th Texas Legislature
 hereby pay tribute to the lives of Irma Linda and Jose Antonio
 Garcia and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of their
 family: to their children, Lyliana Analise Garcia, Alysandra
 Celeste Garcia, Cristian Antonio Garcia, and Jose Alejandro Garcia;
 to Mrs. Garcia's father, Manuel Z. Lozano, and her siblings, Velma
 Lisa Duran, Marissa Lozano, and Marcus Lozano; to Mr. Garcia's
 siblings, Maria G. Esparza and Armando P. Garcia; to the couple's
 other relatives and friends; and to the countless others in Uvalde
 and beyond who mourn their passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Irma and Joe Garcia.