Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR576 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/02/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 576
 In Memory
 of
 Irma L. Garcia and Jose A. Garcia
 WHEREAS, Citizens of Uvalde lost two beloved residents
 with the tragic passing of Irma Linda Garcia on May 24, 2022, at
 the age of 48, and her husband, Jose Antonio Garcia, on May 26,
 2022, at the age of 50; and
 WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia formed a strong and lasting
 bond of devotion during the 25 years they shared as husband and
 wife; they were high school sweethearts who went on to exchange
 wedding vows in Uvalde on June 28, 1997, and they took immense joy
 in raising their four children, Lyliana, Alysandra, Cristian,
 and Jose; and
 WHEREAS, Born in San Antonio on December 11, 1973, Irma
 Garcia was the daughter of Manuel Z. Lozano and Olga Salazar; she
 grew up with the companionship of two sisters, Velma and Marissa,
 and a brother, Marcus; after receiving her bachelor's degree in
 interdisciplinary studies from Sul Ross State University in
 1997, she embarked on a 23-year career as an elementary teacher
 with the Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District; she
 found great fulfillment in engaging with her students and helping
 to set them on a path toward higher education; and
 WHEREAS, Joe Garcia was born in Uvalde on April 18, 1972,
 and was raised by his mother, Maria Garcia, along with his three
 siblings, Armando, Maria, and Antonio; for more than three
 decades, he was employed with H-E-B, where he rose from produce
 stocker to a position in management; throughout his career, he
 was admired by his colleagues for his work ethic and his drive to
 ensure that every task was done the right way; and
 WHEREAS, Irma and Joe Garcia shared an unwavering
 commitment to their family, to their community, and to one
 another, and the couple will forever remain a source of
 inspiration to all who were fortunate enough to know them; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the lives of Irma Linda and
 Jose Antonio Garcia and extend heartfelt condolences to the
 members of their family:  to their children, Lyliana Analise
 Garcia, Alysandra Celeste Garcia, Cristian Antonio Garcia, and
 Jose Alejandro Garcia; to Mrs. Garcia's father, Manuel Z.
 Lozano, and her siblings, Velma Lisa Duran, Marissa Lozano, and
 Marcus Lozano; to Mr. Garcia's siblings, Maria G. Esparza and
 Armando P. Garcia; to the couple's other relatives and friends;
 and to the countless others in Uvalde and beyond who mourn their
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Irma and Joe Garcia.
 Gutierrez
 Alvarado Hinojosa Nichols Alvarado Hinojosa Nichols
Alvarado Hinojosa Nichols
 Bettencourt Huffman Parker Bettencourt Huffman Parker
Bettencourt Huffman Parker
 Birdwell Hughes Paxton Birdwell Hughes Paxton
Birdwell Hughes Paxton
 Blanco Johnson Perry Blanco Johnson Perry
Blanco Johnson Perry
 Campbell King Schwertner Campbell King Schwertner
Campbell King Schwertner
 Creighton Kolkhorst Sparks Creighton Kolkhorst Sparks
Creighton Kolkhorst Sparks
 Eckhardt LaMantia Springer Eckhardt LaMantia Springer
Eckhardt LaMantia Springer
 Flores Menéndez West Flores Menéndez West
Flores Menéndez West
 Hall Middleton Whitmire Hall Middleton Whitmire
Hall Middleton Whitmire
 Hancock Miles Zaffirini Hancock Miles Zaffirini
Hancock Miles Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 24, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Alvarado Hinojosa Nichols

Bettencourt Huffman Parker

Birdwell Hughes Paxton

Blanco Johnson Perry

Campbell King Schwertner

Creighton Kolkhorst Sparks

Eckhardt LaMantia Springer

Flores Menéndez West

Hall Middleton Whitmire

Hancock Miles Zaffirini