Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Resolutions Calendars Committee Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR305

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Commemorating Cinco de Mayo, 2009.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR306

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Honoring members of the Texas Dental Association and Texas Dental Association Smiles Foundation for their contributions to the 2009 Texas Missions of Mercy.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR308

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez and recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2009, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR309

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Recognizing the week of April 26 through May 2, 2009, as National Crime Victims' Rights Week.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR307

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Paying tribute to the life of William C. Velasquez, founder of the Southwest Voter Registration Education Project, on June 15, 2009, the 21st anniversary of his death.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR313

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Recognizing the 22nd annual Grand Prairie Cinco de Mayo Celebration.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR311

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Honoring the life of Benito Juarez on March 21, 2009, the 203rd anniversary of his birth.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR314

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Honoring Oak Cliff on the occasion of the 106th anniversary of its annexation to Dallas.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR310

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Commemorating the 161st anniversary of the date the Treaty of Guadalupe Hidalgo was signed, ending the Mexican War.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR312

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Commemorating the 41st anniversary of the 1969 Crystal City student walkout.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR315

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Recognizing Diez y Seiz de Septiembre (Mexican Independence Day) for 2010.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR319

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Honoring Representative Irma Rangel and the sixth anniversary of the opening of the Irma Lerma Rangel Young Women's Leadership School in Dallas.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR321

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
Commemorating the fourth anniversary of the Dallas Mega March for American Values and Justice on April 9, 2010.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR316

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
In memory of Selena Quintanilla Perez on March 31, 2010, the 15th anniversary of her death.
TX

Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HR318

Introduced
2/6/09  
Refer
2/19/09  
Enrolled
3/16/09  
In memory of Tejano legend Laura Canales of Kingsville on April 16, 2010, the fifth anniversary of her death.