Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Urban Affairs Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/02/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/25/2023 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 25 2023 1:56PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/25/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
04/18/2023
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/22/2023 S Vote taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
04/11/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
04/04/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/28/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/18/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/21/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/14/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23