LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Committees
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs
Calendar
TX
Senate Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Senate Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/19/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
05/12/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
05/08/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
05/04/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
05/01/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/26/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/24/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/18/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/17/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/13/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/03/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
03/27/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
03/20/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
03/13/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
02/27/2023
Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details