Texas 2023 - 88th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB16 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Harrison H.B. No. 16
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to the abolition of ad valorem taxes and the creation of a
77 joint interim committee on the abolition of those taxes.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "committee" means the joint
1010 interim committee on the abolition of ad valorem taxes.
1111 (b) The joint interim committee on the abolition of ad
1212 valorem taxes is composed of:
1313 (1) five members of the house of representatives
1414 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; and
1515 (2) five senators appointed by the lieutenant
1616 governor.
1717 (c) The speaker of the house of representatives and the
1818 lieutenant governor shall make the appointments under Subsection
1919 (b) of this section not later than February 1, 2024.
2020 (d) The speaker of the house of representatives and the
2121 lieutenant governor shall each designate a co-chair from among the
2222 committee members.
2323 (e) The committee shall convene at the joint call of the
2424 co-chairs.
2525 (f) The committee has all other powers and duties provided
2626 to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and
2727 house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government
2828 Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on
2929 administration.
3030 (g) The committee shall conduct a comprehensive study to
3131 determine how to replace local tax revenue that will be lost when ad
3232 valorem taxes are abolished with local sales and use tax revenue.
3333 (h) The committee shall:
3434 (1) consider whether political subdivisions that
3535 currently impose ad valorem taxes would have the authority to
3636 impose sales and use taxes;
3737 (2) determine the average sales and use tax rate for
3838 each type of political subdivision that would be necessary to
3939 generate the same amount of tax revenue as the amount of tax revenue
4040 lost as a result of the abolition of ad valorem taxes;
4141 (3) determine, if appropriate, the effect that
4242 broadening the application of sales and use taxes at the local level
4343 would have on the tax rates identified under Subdivision (2) of this
4444 subsection;
4545 (4) identify whether tax revenue generated by sales
4646 and use taxes would require redistribution to offset disparities in
4747 available local tax revenue as a result of the abolition of ad
4848 valorem taxes and, if so, evaluate the different mechanisms of
4949 redistribution available; and
5050 (5) identify and examine any other issue that would
5151 need to be addressed to implement the abolition of ad valorem taxes.
5252 (i) On request of the committee, a state agency or political
5353 subdivision shall provide information for and assistance in
5454 conducting the study under this section.
5555 (j) Not later than December 1, 2024, the committee shall
5656 prepare and submit to the legislature a written report containing
5757 the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or
5858 other action.
5959 (k) The committee is abolished and this section expires
6060 January 1, 2025.
6161 SECTION 2. (a) Title 1, Tax Code, is repealed.
6262 (b) Notwithstanding any other law, this state or a political
6363 subdivision of this state may not impose an ad valorem tax. To the
6464 extent of a conflict, this section controls over a conflicting
6565 provision in a general or special law.
6666 (c) The change in law made by this section does not affect
6767 tax liability accruing before January 1, 2029. That liability
6868 continues in effect as if this section had not been enacted, and the
6969 former law is continued in effect for the collection of taxes due
7070 and for civil and criminal enforcement of the liability for those
7171 taxes.
7272 SECTION 3. (a) This Act takes effect as provided by
7373 Subsections (b) and (c) of this section, but only if the
7474 constitutional amendment proposed by the 88th Legislature, 1st
7575 Called Session, 2023, to abolish ad valorem taxes is approved by the
7676 voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act
7777 has no effect.
7878 (b) This section and Section 1 of this Act take effect
7979 January 1, 2024.
8080 (c) Section 2 of this Act takes effect January 1, 2029.