Texas 2023 - 88th 1st C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill May 30, 2023
Bill May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill June 7, 2023
Bill June 7, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill June 6, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill June 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note June 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2023