Senate | 06/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 53 | |
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 33 | |
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 30 | |
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 25 | |
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 25 | |
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |