E | 07/14/2023 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 65 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 28 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 64 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 65 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 64 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 28 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 28 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Point of order sustained | Journal Page: 28 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Point of order | Journal Page: 27 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Gutierrez | Journal Page: 27 |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 27 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Gutierrez | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 26 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 25 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 65 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 59 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Adopted as amended | Journal Page: 59 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Amendment withdrawn | 2-Morales Shaw | Journal Page: 59 |
House | 07/13/2023 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Article III, Section 40 | Journal Page: 59 |
House | 07/13/2023 | Amended | 1-Metcalf | Journal Page: 57 |
House | 07/13/2023 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 28 | |
House | 07/12/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 22 | |
House | 07/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 07/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 07/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/10/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 14 | |
House | 07/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 14 | |
House | 07/10/2023 | Filed |