E | 07/22/2023 | Effective on 1/1/24 | ||
E | 07/22/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 29 | |
E | 07/21/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 29 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 64 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 28 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 29 | |
Senate | 07/13/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 26 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 62 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Record vote | RV#30 | Journal Page: 62 |
House | 07/13/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 62 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 62 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 30 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 30 | |
House | 07/13/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3 | Journal Page: 30 |
House | 07/13/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 62 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 62 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#13 | Journal Page: 30 |
House | 07/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 65 | |
House | 07/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/12/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 07/12/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 17 | |
House | 07/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 17 | |
House | 07/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 23 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Ordered not printed | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 23 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 19 | |
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 07/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 17 | |
Senate | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 16 | |
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 22 | |
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |