Texas 2023 - 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2023
Bill October 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill October 23, 2023
Analysis October 23, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis October 31, 2023
Bill October 26, 2023
Bill October 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill November 2, 2023
Analysis November 1, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill November 2, 2023
Bill October 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis November 1, 2023
Analysis October 31, 2023
Analysis October 23, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note November 1, 2023
Fiscal Note October 31, 2023
Fiscal Note October 18, 2023