Texas 2023 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR135 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/02/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 135


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, La Vernia lost an admired civic leader with the
 passing of former mayor Ewald Edward Koepp Jr. on March 20, 2016, at
 the age of 86; and
 WHEREAS, The son of E. O. and Theresa Koepp, "Junior" Koepp
 was born on February 3, 1930; he played football as a student at La
 Vernia High School and Texas Lutheran University, and he served his
 country in the U.S. military during the Korean War; following in his
 father's footsteps, he began working in the automotive industry at
 an early age, and in 1969, he took over the family business, Koepp
 Chevrolet; he dedicated himself to providing top-notch customer
 service and the dealership flourished; he also took pride in his
 role as developer of the Silverado Hills and Westover subdivisions;
 and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Koepp served his community in numerous
 leadership roles; during 14 years as mayor, he oversaw the paving of
 roads and the installation of a sewer system, among other
 improvements; he further served as a member of the county school
 board and Wilson County appraisal board and as an officer in the
 volunteer fire department; a founder of the La Vernia Chamber of
 Commerce and the Greater La Vernia Chamber of Commerce, he was an
 active member of the Lions Club, Sons of Hermann, and American
 Legion; he benefited youth as a scout leader, and he was a past
 master of Masonic Lodge No. 226 and a member of Alzahar Temple;
 committed to conservative values, he organized the Wilson County
 Republican Party and served as chair for a dozen years; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man, Mr. Koepp married Jewel Helmke
 on April 10, 1955, and they became the parents of two sons, Dwight
 and Hiram, and a daughter, Melissa; eventually, he was blessed with
 nine grandchildren, Eric, Andrew, Lauren, Jessica, Elise,
 Alexandria, Travis, Parker, and Ryan; sustained by a strong faith,
 Mr. Koepp was a valued member of Immanuel Lutheran Church, where he
 served as councilman and as a member of the cemetery committee;
 following his retirement, he enjoyed spending time with friends and
 relatives, working cattle on his ranch, fishing, hunting, and
 pursuing his great passion, taking care of the land; and
 WHEREAS, Junior Koepp gave freely of his time and expertise
 to better his community, and his selfless example of public service
 and civic engagement remains a source of inspiration to all who were
 privileged to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Ewald Edward Koepp Jr. and extend sincere condolences to his family
 and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Junior
 Koepp.
 Guillen
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 135 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on November 1, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House