Texas 2023 - 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis October 9, 2023
Bill October 5, 2023
Bill October 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill October 13, 2023
Bill October 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill October 11, 2023
Witness List

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note October 15, 2023
Fiscal Note October 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill October 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis October 9, 2023