Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas House Bill HCR4 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.C.R. No. 4
1+By: Craddick H.C.R. No. 4
22
33
44 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
55 WHEREAS, The Honorable Walter David Counts Jr. of Knox City,
66 a former state representative and brevet brigadier general in the
77 Texas Army National Guard, passed away on August 18, 2023, at the
88 age of 87; and
99 WHEREAS, Born in Munday on July 14, 1936, David Counts was the
1010 son of Walter and Alma Counts; he grew up in Rule and attended West
1111 Texas State College and North Texas State College; in 1953, he
1212 joined the Texas Army National Guard, and over the course of 32
1313 years in the military, he attained the rank of colonel;
1414 then-governor George W. Bush promoted him to brevet brigadier
1515 general following his retirement; among other honors, he received
1616 the General K. L. Bailey Award for heroism and the Minute Man Award
1717 for outstanding service; and
1818 WHEREAS, Mr. Counts wed the love of his life, the former Mary
1919 Mullins, on July 15, 1956; they became the proud parents of two
2020 children, Patti and David, and through the years, their family grew
2121 to include four grandchildren, Seth, Jennifer, Sarah, and Matthew,
2222 as well as eight great-grandchildren; and
2323 WHEREAS, Settling in Knox City, Mr. Counts established Counts
2424 Insurance Agency in 1960; he operated the business for 35 years, and
2525 he also founded Counts Real Estate; in addition, he owned a
2626 bookkeeping and tax service for a decade and grew wheat and cotton
2727 in Knox, Stonewall, and Haskell Counties; he served as vice
2828 president and director of Rolling Plains Well Service, as president
2929 and chair of Chap Operating Company, as director and treasurer of
3030 Perry Pump Service, and as a director of both First Bank of West
3131 Texas and Western Bancshares; moreover, he was a member of the board
3232 of the Texas Association of Realtors; and
3333 WHEREAS, Mr. Counts was first elected to the Texas House of
3434 Representatives in 1988, and for the next 15 years, he worked
3535 tirelessly in behalf of his constituents, who resided primarily in
3636 the North Central Plains region; he chaired the Natural Resources
3737 Committee for a decade, co-chaired the Water Resources Committee,
3838 and served on many other committees, including the Insurance,
3939 Redistricting, and State Affairs Committees; he authored a
4040 constitutional amendment to exempt Masonic lodges from ad valorem
4141 taxes; and
4242 WHEREAS, A member of the Masons for more than six decades, Mr.
4343 Counts was raised to the degree of Master Mason in 1961, and he
4444 served three separate terms as Worshipful Master; he began his
4545 association with the Grand Lodge of Texas in 1971 and rose to become
4646 Most Worshipful Grand Master, the highest office in Texas Masonry,
4747 in 2008; he gave generously of his time and talents to a host of
4848 Masonic groups, and he served as treasurer of Masonic Children &
4949 Family Services of Texas and as a trustee of Scottish Rite for
5050 Children; the recipient of numerous honors, he was inducted into
5151 the Masonic Grand Lodge Library and Museum of Texas Sam Houston Hall
5252 of Fame and served as a patron of the library and museum; and
5353 WHEREAS, Mr. Counts also contributed to the greater community
5454 through his longtime service as a director of the Knox City Chamber
5555 of Commerce and as a member of the Knox City Lions Club; he
5656 benefited higher education as a member of several boards, including
5757 the development board of Hardin-Simmons University; he was a valued
5858 congregant of First Baptist Church of Knox City and gave generously
5959 of his time and resources to Gideons International; and
6060 WHEREAS, David Counts lived a life that was rich in public
6161 service and in personal and professional achievements, and his
6262 contributions will be remembered and admired for years to come;
6363 now, therefore, be it
6464 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas,
6565 4th Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Walter David
6666 Counts Jr. and extend sincere condolences to the members of his
6767 family: to his wife, Mary Counts; to his children, Patti Counts
6868 Holmes and her husband, Steve, and David Counts III and his wife,
6969 Jill; to his grandchildren, Seth Barnett and his wife, Jenni,
7070 Jennifer McCann and her husband, Josh, Sarah Grace and her husband,
7171 Jacob, and Matthew Counts and his wife, Allie; to his eight
7272 great-grandchildren; to his sister, Cheryl Robinson, and her
7373 husband, Bobby; and to his many other relatives and friends; and, be
7474 it further
7575 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
7676 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
7777 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
7878 David Counts.
79- Craddick
80- ______________________________ ______________________________
81- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
82- I certify that H.C.R. No. 4 was unanimously adopted by a
83- rising vote of the House on November 17, 2023.
84- ______________________________
85- Chief Clerk of the House
86- I certify that H.C.R. No. 4 was unanimously adopted by a
87- rising vote of the Senate on November 30, 2023.
88- ______________________________
89- Secretary of the Senate
90- APPROVED: __________________
91- Date
92- __________________
93- Governor