Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/08/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/08/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/01/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
05/01/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/23/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
04/23/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
04/15/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
04/15/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
04/08/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Administration
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Administration
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Administration
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
04/03/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
03/27/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
03/20/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in committee