Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

House Environmental Regulation Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/08/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/08/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/01/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
05/01/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/24/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/24/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/17/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/17/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/03/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
03/27/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce