Date
Event
Location
04/24/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/24/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/17/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/17/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/03/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
03/27/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
03/20/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House