House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#973 | Journal Page: 2302 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Motion to reconsider fails | Journal Page: 2302 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#973 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 2271 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2211 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#877 | Journal Page: 2211 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Failed to pass to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#877 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2205 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 449 | |
House | 03/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 449 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |