LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1029
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1029
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1029
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/20/2025
8:00 am
Transportation Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
HB408
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
HB787
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Postponed
HB1029
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Posting rule suspended
HB1126
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB1136
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB1607
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House