Senate | 05/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1859 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1423 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#405 | Journal Page: 1688 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1628 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#356 | Journal Page: 1636 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#356 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#355 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended | 1-Noble | Journal Page: 1626 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1635 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended 1-Noble | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 880 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 03/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |