LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1085
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1085
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1085
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/18/2025
8:00 am
Public Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 140
HB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB27
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
HB123
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on Major State Calendar
HB210
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB213
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
HB222
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
HB610
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1085
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
HB1481
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House