Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 26, 2024
Bill November 13, 2024

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Analysis May 2, 2025
Witness List May 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 2, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 27, 2025
Fiscal Note April 20, 2025