LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1163
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1163
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1163
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/19/2025
8:00 am
Natural Resources Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.036
HB1089
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
HB1163
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1177
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1238
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB1318
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB1400
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB1407
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Postponed
HB1532
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HJR7
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Finance