House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1534 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2466 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 464 | |
House | 03/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 464 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |