Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1181 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 25, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Witness List May 1, 2025
Analysis May 1, 2025
Bill May 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2025