Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2099 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#775 | Journal Page: 2103 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2103 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2103 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#775 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2018 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#699 | Journal Page: 2017 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2021 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#699 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 2016 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#698 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2016 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Amended 1-Guillen | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Referred to s/c on Property Tax Appraisals by Speaker | Journal Page: 471 | |
House | 03/10/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 471 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |