Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#552
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1867
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1846
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1846
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|