Senate | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#967 | Journal Page: 2297 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2297 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#819 | Journal Page: 2150 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2154 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#819 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended | 1-Bonnen | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 1-Bonnen | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2154 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 605 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 605 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |