Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1758 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2312 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#984 | Journal Page: 2311 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2311 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#984 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2169 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#837 | Journal Page: 2168 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#837 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2169 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker | Journal Page: 478 | |
House | 03/10/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 478 | |
House | 11/14/2024 | Filed |