Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2503 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1149 | Journal Page: 2502 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2502 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2502 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1079 | Journal Page: 2394 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1079 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended | 1-Hernandez | Journal Page: 2394 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended 1-Hernandez | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1360 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 11/15/2024 | Filed |