House | 04/29/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2128 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 783 | Journal Page: 2126 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Postponed | 4/29/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1795 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1795 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Postponed 4/29/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 11/15/2024 | Filed |