Senate | 05/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1492 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1837 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#371 | Journal Page: 1661 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#316 | Journal Page: 1588 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended | 1-Zwiener | Journal Page: 1587 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#316 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended 1-Zwiener | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 910 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 03/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 448 | |
House | 03/06/2025 | Filed |