Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1370 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Record vote | RV#310 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1568 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1580 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1527 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1063 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 436 | |
House | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |