Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#985 | Journal Page: 2312 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2313 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#985 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2313 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#838 | Journal Page: 2164 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#838 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2169 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1685 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 11/22/2024 | Filed |