Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1465 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 25, 2024
Fiscal Note November 25, 2024

House Committee Report

Witness List April 17, 2025
Analysis April 17, 2025
Fiscal Note April 17, 2025
Bill April 17, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2025
Fiscal Note March 24, 2025