Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2852 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2701 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1319 | Journal Page: 2701 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2701 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2701 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2584 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1218 | Journal Page: 2583 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2583 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1218 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 2-Moody and Cook | Journal Page: 2583 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 2-Moody | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | 5/1/25 2:30 PM | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed 5/1/25 2:30 PM | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 1-Leo Wilson | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 498 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 498 | |
House | 12/02/2024 | Filed |