Senate | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1826 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#376 | Journal Page: 1665 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1665 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Amended | 1-Capriglione | Journal Page: 1665 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1665 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#322 | Journal Page: 1594 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#322 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1594 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1606 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#321 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended | 1-Capriglione | Journal Page: 1593 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amended 1-Capriglione | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1605 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1360 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 606 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Filed |