Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1321 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1442 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | RV#215 | Journal Page: 1441 |
House | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1385 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | RV#189 | Journal Page: 1384 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1384 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Amended | 5-J. Gonzlez | Journal Page: 1384 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 1383 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Amended 4-Hopper | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | 4-Hopper | Journal Page: 1383 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Amendment withdrawn | 3-Hopper | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Amendment(s) offered 3-Hopper | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Amendment tabled | 2-Hopper | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote RV#186 | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Amendment tabled 2-Hopper | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote RV#185 | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1380 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Amended 1-Campos | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Placed on Emergency Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 909 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 487 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |