Senate | 05/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1755 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2852 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1266 | Journal Page: 2653 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1158 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2516 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2516 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2270 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Filed |