LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB153
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB153
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB153
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025
8:00 am
Corrections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.014
HB153
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
HB1828
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2306
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:44PM
HB2498
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
HB3464
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3488
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3636
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3673
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3834
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3860
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4120
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB4937
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1515
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/02/2025
8:00 am
Corrections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.014
HB153
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
HB1410
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1461
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB1760
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB1762
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB3261
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3773
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call