Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1533 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/20/2025 10:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee