House | 05/02/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 512 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 512 | |
House | 12/06/2024 | Filed |