House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1267 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1159 | Journal Page: 2519 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-K. Bell | Journal Page: 2517 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2517 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 606 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Filed |