Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#552 | Journal Page: 1868 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1868 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1868 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1848 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1848 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1532 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 328 | |
House | 02/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 328 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |