Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#991 | Journal Page: 2317 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2317 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2317 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#844 | Journal Page: 2177 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#844 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended | 2-Oliverson and Morgan | Journal Page: 2176 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 2-Oliverson | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 1-Oliverson | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1645 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 515 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 515 | |
House | 12/11/2024 | Filed |