Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB16 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/02/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Postponed