House | 05/05/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2045 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#712 | Journal Page: 2040 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 2040 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |