Senate | 05/07/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1611 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2988 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2988 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#712 | Journal Page: 2040 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 2040 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#712 | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |